CA AB2805 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 11.8 (commencing with Section 14190) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to cargo theft.
Title
Cargo theft: working group.
Sponsors
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2805 OLSEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2805 Olsen By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2805 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2805 Olsen By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2805 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6138.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5053.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4592.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14190 | New Code | See Bill Text |