CA AB2811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17602 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business regulation.
Title
Advertising: automatic renewal and continuous service offers: notice and online termination.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2811 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 4815.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |