CA AB2849 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33302 and 33321 of, and to add Section 33345.1 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.
Title
Sierra Nevada Conservancy: watershed improvement: tribal organization.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2849 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2849 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2849 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2849 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2849 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6359.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5281.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5304.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 33302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 33321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 33345.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 9001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |