CA AB2860 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 31900), Article 5 (commencing with Section 32000), and Article 6 (commencing with Section 32100) of, Chapter 4 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: unsafe handguns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
2018-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code31900Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code32000Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code32100Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback