CA AB2869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 236.14 of the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking: vacatur relief for victims: fines.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] |
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 236.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2869 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2869 |