CA AB2875 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 437c of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: summary judgment: service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2875 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 437 | Amended Code | Citation Text |