CA AB2883 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8221.5, 8222, 8227.7, 8262.3, and 8450 of the Education Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare services: alternative payment programs: direct deposits: reserve funds.
Sponsors
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2883 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4773.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8221.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8227.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8262.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |