CA AB289 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 8549) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to public records, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Public Records Act Ombudsperson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-03-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 289 Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 289 Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1861.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8549 | New Code | See Bill Text |