CA AB2895 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1946.2 of, and to add and repeal Section 798.30.5 of, the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome parks: rent caps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2895 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 4752.) |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 20). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1946.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 798.30.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |