CA AB290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 862, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 862, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1210, 1367.016, and 1385.09 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10176.11 and 10181.8 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care service plans and health insurance: third-party payments.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 290 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB290 Wood et al. By Leyva (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 290 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB290 Wood et al. By Leyva (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 290 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 862, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 3268.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2679.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 3). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 15. Page 1801.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.016 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10176.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |