CA AB2913 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 104559.1) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to tobacco, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Unflavored tobacco list.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104559.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2913 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2913 |