CA AB2921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 28104, 28130, and 28134 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Student Loan Servicing Act: student loan accounts.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2921 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4678.) |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and HIGHER ED. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 28104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 28134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |