CA AB2959 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 40059.4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: byproducts from the processing of food or beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2959 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 16.)
2020-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 13).
2020-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-05-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code40059.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback