CA AB296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 3.6.5 (commencing with Section 71140) of Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, and to add and repeal Article 27 (commencing with Section 18918) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to climate change, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Climate change: Climate Innovation Grant Program: voluntary tax contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 296 Cooley Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB296 Cooley et al. By Stern (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 296 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By MAYES (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB296 Cooley et al. By Stern (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 296 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By MAYES (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-02 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3137.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 2559.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 10). |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2092.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on REV. & TAX) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71140 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18918 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |