CA AB2960 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8698.1 of the Government Code, relating to shelters.
Title
Shelter crises: fire and life safety standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2960 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2960 Gipson et al. By Caballero (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2960 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2960 Gipson et al. By Caballero (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2960 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5344.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4355.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4828.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8698.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |