CA AB2967 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20460 and 20502 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public Employees’ Retirement System: contracting agencies: exclusion from membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2967 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2967 O'Donnell et al. By Pan (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2967 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2967 O'Donnell et al. By Pan (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2967 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 7. Page 5377.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4296.). |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4729.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |