CA AB2972 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Caballero.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Caballero.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2820 to the Vehicle Code, relating to enforcement.
Title
Vehicles: enforcement: motorcycle profiling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2972 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Caballero. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5693.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Caballero. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 21. Noes 28. Page 4793.). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 2820 | New Code | See Bill Text |