CA AB2986 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8245 and 8246 of, and to add Sections 8248 and 8249 to, the Education Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Family childcare home education networks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8245 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8248 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8249 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2986 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2986 |