CA AB3005 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1602.5 to the Fish and Game Code, to add Section 21163 to the Public Contract Code, to add Chapter 6.8 (commencing with Section 21189.60) to Division 13 of the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 13160.2 to, and to add Part 4 (commencing with Section 6700) to Division 3 of, the Water Code, relating to the Leroy Anderson Dam and Reservoir, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Leroy Anderson Dam and Reservoir: permitting, environmental review, and public contracting.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3005 Robert Rivas Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3005 Robert Rivas et al. By Monning Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3005 Robert Rivas Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3005 Robert Rivas et al. By Monning Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3005 Robert Rivas Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5443.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2020-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4763.). |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1602.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 21163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13160.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |