CA AB3010 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23001, 23016, and 23036 of, and to add Section 23036.5 to, the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
California Deferred Deposit Transaction Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 23001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 23016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 23036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 23036.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3010 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3010 |