CA AB302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 76012 and 76012.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Parking: homeless students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 302 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 302 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 8. Page 1861.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 76012.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |