CA AB303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6603 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: sexually violent predators: trial: continuances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 303 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB303 Cervantes By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 303 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB303 Cervantes By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 303 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3138.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2559.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1793.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |