CA AB3040 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4830.7 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 597.9 of, and to repeal and add Section 286.5 of, the Penal Code, relating to sexual abuse of animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual abuse of animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 3040 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5132.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4830.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code286.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code597.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback