CA AB3062 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 430.41, 435.5, and 439 of, to amend and repeal Section 472a of, and to repeal and amend Section 472 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: pleadings and motions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3062 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4729.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 430.41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 435.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 439 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 472 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |