CA AB3070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add, repeal, and add Section 231.7 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to juries.
Title
Juries: peremptory challenges.
Sponsors
Asm. Shirley Weber [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3070 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3070 Weber et al. By Wiener (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3070 Weber et al. By Wiener Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3070 Weber et al. By Wiener (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3070 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3070 Weber et al. By Wiener (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3070 Weber et al. By Wiener Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3070 Weber et al. By Wiener (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3070 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 5508.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 5507.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 11.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (August 7). |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 4821.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 2). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |