CA AB3073 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18901.35 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalFresh: preenrollment.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3073 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3073 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3073 Wicks Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3073 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3073 Wicks Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5330.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4379.). |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4729.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |