CA AB3088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1946.2, 1947.12, and 1947.13 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 798.56, 1942.5, 2924.15 of, to add Title 19 (commencing with Section 3273.01) to Part 4 of Division 3 of, and to add and repeal Section 789.4 of, the Civil Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1161 and 1161.2 of, to add Section 1161.2.5 to, to add and repeal Section 116.223 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 1179.01) of Title 3 of Part 3 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to COVID-19 relief, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tenancy: rental payment default: mortgage forbearance: state of emergency: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3088 CHIU Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3088 Chiu et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3088 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3088 Chiu et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3088 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2020-08-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-08-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 5463.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5463.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4680.) |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1942.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1946.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1947.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1947.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 798.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |