CA AB3092 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 340.16 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Sexual assault and other sexual misconduct: statutes of limitations on civil actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3092 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CHAU (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3092 Wicks et al. By Monning (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3092 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3092 Wicks et al. By Monning (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3092 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5357.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4403.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 4777.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |