CA AB310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 16430, 16500, 16500.5, 16521, 53601, 53630.5, 53635, 53638, 53651, 63010, 63021, 63025.1, 63035, 63050, 63088.3, and 63089.98 of, to add Sections 16480.46, 63021.1, 63021.2, 63021.3, 63025.10, 63037 to, to add Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 63089.85) to Chapter 6 of Division 1 of Title 6.7 of, to add Chapter 7 (commencing with 63090) to Division 1 of Title 6.7 of, and to repeal Section 63021.5 of, the Government Code, relating to the California Infrastructure and Economic Development Bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Infrastructure and Economic Development Bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 310 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-06-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-29SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-07-02SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-25SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1925.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 19).
2019-03-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2019-01-30AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
2019-01-29AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code16430Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16480.46New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16500Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16500.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16521Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53601Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53630.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53635Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53638Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53651Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63010Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63021Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63021.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63021.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63021.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63021.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63025.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63025.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63035Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63037New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63050Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63088.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63089.98Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback