CA AB3120 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 340.1 and 1002 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 905 of the Government Code, relating to childhood sexual assault.
Title
Damages: childhood sexual assault: statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3120 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3120 Gonzalez Fletcher By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3120 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3120 Gonzalez Fletcher By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3120 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 6979.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5879.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | (Received pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).) |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 9. Page 5504.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |