CA AB3121 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 8301) of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study and Develop Reparation Proposals for African Americans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3121 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3121 Weber et al. By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3121 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 5370.).
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3.).
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 4829.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8301New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback