CA AB315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50024 and 53060.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: lobbying associations: expenditure of public funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53060.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |