CA AB3172 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to park property.
Title
Park property: City of Modesto: Beard Brook Park.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 3172 Gray Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4603.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |