CA AB3179 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on ED. and P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on ED. and P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42127.6 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 3547.5 of, and to add Section 3547.6 to, the Government Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: school district finances: Educational Employment Relations Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and P.E. & R. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42127.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3547.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3547.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3179 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3179 |