CA AB3191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 241.9 and 243.11 to the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 21809 and 25260 of the Vehicle Code, relating to utilities.
Title
Utility workers and vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 241.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 243.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 21809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 25260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3191 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3191 |