CA AB32 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5003.1 to, and to add Title 9.5 (commencing with Section 9500) to Part 3 of, the Penal Code, relating to detention facilities.
Title
Detention facilities: private, for-profit administration services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 32 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Noes (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB32 Bonta et al. By Durazo (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 32 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Noes (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB32 Bonta et al. By Durazo (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 32 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3419.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2762.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1915.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 5003.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |