CA AB321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 6388.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemptions: trucks for use in interstate or out-of-state commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 321 Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB321 Patterson By Borgeas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 321 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB321 Patterson By Borgeas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 321 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 2791.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2206.). |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1469.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6388.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |