CA AB3216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2810.8 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Unemployment: rehiring and retention: state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3216 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3216 Kalra et al. By Durazo (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - AB 3216 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3216 Kalra et al. By Durazo (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - AB 3216 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 16. Page 5454.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 17. Page 4916.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2810.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |