CA AB323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2750.3 and 2783 of the Labor Code, and to add and repeal Chapter 2.8 (commencing with Section 11800) of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to newspapers.
Title
Newspapers: state agency advertising: worker status: independent contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 323 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB323 Blanca Rubio et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - AB 323 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB323 Blanca Rubio et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - AB 323 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 5430.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 4130.) |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3865.) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 3787.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 28. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2783 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 11800 | New Code | See Bill Text |