CA AB3234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 334, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 334, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3055 of, and to add Chapter 2.96 (commencing with Section 1001.95) to Title 6 of Part 2 of, the Penal Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public Safety.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3234 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - AB 3234 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - AB 3234 GLORIA Remove from Inactive File By TING Amendment Set #1 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - AB 3234 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - AB 3234 GLORIA Remove from Inactive File By TING Amendment Set #1 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 334, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 26. Page 5183.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 12. Page 5181.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5165.) |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 5). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5069.) |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 40. Noes 18. Page 5067.) |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5059.) |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5059.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gloria. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 3055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |