CA AB3235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17568.6 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to advertising.
Title
Short-term lodging rates.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17568.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |