CA AB326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Died on call pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c) of the Constitution.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Died on call pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c) of the Constitution.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2f (commencing with Section 3000) to Title 14 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Electric mobility manufacturers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 326 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 326 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Died on call pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (August 4). |
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3940.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3000 | New Code | See Bill Text |