CA AB3300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 13050) to Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Homelessness: California Access to Housing and Services Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 3300 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 4887.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13050 | New Code | See Bill Text |