CA AB3312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 56748 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local agency formation: annexation: City of Merced.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Assembly - AB 3312 Gray Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3312 Gray By Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3312 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3312 Gray By Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3312 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5229.). |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4294.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4817.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 56748 | New Code | See Bill Text |