CA AB3330 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2499.5 and 4970 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 208, 4971, 4984.7, 4989.68, 4996.3, and 4999.120 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Department of Consumer Affairs.
Title
Department of Consumer Affairs: boards: licensees: regulatory fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3330 Calderon By Mitchell (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - AB 3330 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - AB 3330 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 29). |
2020-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 5207.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5165.) |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 18). |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (August 10). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5066.) |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5059.) |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member O'Donnell. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 208 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2499.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4970 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4971 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4984.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.68 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.120 | New Code | See Bill Text |