CA AB3362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6026.7, 6060, 6086.10, 6090.5, 6140, 6140.5, and 6141 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 6140.03 of, and to add Section 6140.8 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 19280 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to the State Bar of California.
Title
State Bar: open meetings: discipline: attorneys: foreign legal consultants: annual license fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3362 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3362 JUD (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3362 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3362 JUD (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3362 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5330.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4731.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6026.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6086.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6090.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6140.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6140.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |