CA AB3363 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 68701.5, 68703, 68704, 68752, 68754, and 68756 of, to add Section 68701.1 to, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 68770) to Chapter 2.5 of Title 8 of, the Government Code, relating to courts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Commission on Judicial Performance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3363 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4731.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68701.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68701.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68752 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68754 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68756 | Amended Code | Citation Text |