CA AB344 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7.5 (commencing with Section 8270) to Division 8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
New Beginnings California Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB344 Calderon By Beall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 344 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 344 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2527.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 1796.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8270 | New Code | See Bill Text |