CA AB358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 680.3 of, and to add Sections 680.5 and 680.6 to, the Penal Code, relating to sexual assault.
Title
Sexual assault forensic examination kits: databases.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 680.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 680.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 680.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |