CA AB362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 11376.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: overdose prevention program.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 362 Eggman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Result (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Result (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 1927.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11376.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |